EP0047745 - DEVICE FOR SECURING OBJECTS TO A LOAD CARRIER BY MEANS OF BANDS OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.1982 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.1982 [1982/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BJÖRSELL, Lennart Ormbunksvägen 12 S-46100 Trollhättan / SE | [1982/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/12] | Application number, filing date | 81900089.4 | 12.12.1980 | [1982/12] | WO1980SE00332 | Priority number, date | SE19790010316 | 14.12.1979 Original published format: SE 7910316 | [1982/12] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8101693 | Date: | 25.06.1981 | [1981/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047745 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/12] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/04 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
B65B13/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/12] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN AUF EINER PALETTE MIT HILFE VON BÄNDERN ODER DERGLEICHEN | [1982/12] | English: | DEVICE FOR SECURING OBJECTS TO A LOAD CARRIER BY MEANS OF BANDS OR THE LIKE | [1982/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'OBJETS SUR UNE TRANSPORTEUSE DE CHARGES A L'AIDE DE BANDES OU AUTRES | [1982/12] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1981 | Translation filed | Examination procedure | 30.01.1981 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 20.04.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/39] | 01.07.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3213781 ; | [A]US3376807 ; | [A]US3070001 ; | [A]US4106403 ; | [A]DE2456089 ; | [A]NO112884C |