EP0052100 - POWER DRIVE LINE HAVING A WIDE RANGE OF SPEED RATIOS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ipanema Company 841 N. Glengarry Road Birmingham Michigan 48010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | For all designated states Ipanema Company 841 N. Glengarry Road Birmingham Michigan 48010 / US | ||
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states VADETEC CORPORATION 2681 Industrial Row Troy, MI 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEMPER, Yves Jean 841 Glengarry Birmingham, MI 48010 / US | [1982/21] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/01] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/21] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg Postfach 86 06 20 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81900230.4 | 19.05.1980 | [1982/21] | WO1980US00584 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8103370 | Date: | 26.11.1981 | [1981/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052100 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052100 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16H37/06, F16H47/08, F16H37/00, F16H15/00, F16H15/16, G05G1/00 | [1982/21] | CPC: |
F16H15/50 (EP,US);
F16H47/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1982/21] | Title | German: | KRAFTANTRIEBSREIHE MIT GROSSEM ÜBERSETZUNGSVERHÄLTNISBEREICH | [1982/21] | English: | POWER DRIVE LINE HAVING A WIDE RANGE OF SPEED RATIOS | [1982/21] | French: | LIGNE DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE AYANT UNE GRANDE PLAGE DE RAPPORTS DE VITESSE | [1982/21] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.1982 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.1982 | Search fee paid | 15.01.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/28] | 15.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3084569 (HAUSE GILBERT K); | [A]US4131171 (KEYES JOHN H); | [A]US3886810 (SUGIYAMA HIROSHI, et al); | [A]US3670595 (CHERY WALTER VALDEMAR); | [A]US3410146 (NORDEEN DONALD L); | [A]US3618423 (CHERY WALTER V); | [A]US3628398 (CHERY WALTER V); | [A]US3299744 (KRAUS CHARLES E); | [A]US2775683 (KLEIST HERMAN W); | [A]US4112780 (KEMPER YVES JEAN, et al); | [A]US4152946 (KEMPER YVES); | [A]US4112779 (KEMPER YVES JEAN, et al); | [A]US2062901 (GRAHAM LOUIS A); | [A]US3677109 (STUEMKY ROBERT E); | [E]US4238976 (KEMPER YVES J [US]); | [E]US4233851 (KEMPER YVES J); | [A]DE706329 (HERBERT HILKERT); | [A]GB2033034 (VADETEC CORP) |