EP0042409 - RED LIGHT-GREEN LIGHT GAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATTEL, INC. 5150 Rosecrans Avenue Hawthorne California 90250 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | For all designated states MATTEL, INC. 5150 Rosecrans Avenue Hawthorne California 90250 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCK, Gordon H. 3784 Newton Street Torrance, CA 90505 / US | 02 /
HARDWICK, Martha K. 637B West 6th Street Tustin, CA 92680 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [1982/37] | 01 /
BUCK, Gordon H. 3784 Newton Street Torrance, CA 90505 / US | ||
02 /
HARDWICK, Martha K. 637B West 6th Street Redondo Beach, CA 90277 / US | |||
Former [1981/52] | 01 /
BUCK, Gordon H. 3784 Newton Street Torrance, CA 90505 / US | ||
02 /
HARDWICK, Martha K. 615 S. Catalina Street 116 Redondo Beach, CA 90277 / US | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Axel Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 D-81369 München / DE | [1981/52] | Application number, filing date | 81900239.5 | 24.11.1980 | [1981/52] | WO1980US01596 | Priority number, date | US19790106715 | 26.12.1979 Original published format: US 106715 | [1981/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8101798 | Date: | 09.07.1981 | [1981/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042409 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/14 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
A63F9/0096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/52] | Title | German: | ROTLICHT-GRÜNLICHT-LICHTSPIEL | [1981/52] | English: | RED LIGHT-GREEN LIGHT GAME | [1981/52] | French: | JEU FEU VERT-FEU ROUGE | [1981/52] | File destroyed: | 02.12.1992 | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.1981 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.1981 | Search fee paid | 21.08.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/52] | 06.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 16.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1983 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1231810 ; | [A]GB2014049 (GOLDFARB ADOLPH E) | International search | [X]US3423091 (MILLER ALVIN); | [X]US3827693 (BARLOW G, et al); | [X]US3834702 (BLISS W); | [X]US4162792 (CHANG RICHARD S [US], et al); | [XP]US4216965 (BAER RALPH H [US], et al) |