EP0042410 - HEAT CURABLE POLYMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1981/52] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEKOSHI, Tohru 171 Droms Road Scotia, NY 12302 / US | [1981/52] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst, et al Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 81900243.7 | 12.12.1980 | [1981/52] | WO1980US01654 | Priority number, date | US19790107173 | 26.12.1979 Original published format: US 107173 | [1981/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8101855 | Date: | 09.07.1981 | [1981/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042410 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
C08G73/1046 (EP,US);
C08G73/10 (EP,US);
C08G73/101 (EP,US);
C08G73/1053 (EP,US);
C08G73/1064 (EP,US);
C08G73/1067 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/52] | Title | German: | HITZEHÄRTBARE POLYIMIDE | [1981/52] | English: | HEAT CURABLE POLYMIDES | [1981/52] | French: | POLYMIDES POLYMERISABLES A LA CHALEUR | [1981/52] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.1981 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.1981 | Search fee paid | 29.07.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/11] | 23.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/37] | 02.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3528950 (LUBOWITZ HYMAN R); | [A]US3781249 (LUBOWITZ H); | [X]US3842143 (WINTER R); | [X]US3847867 (HEATH D, et al); | [A]US4017511 (WILLIAMS III FRANK J); | [A]US4075171 (D ALELIO GAETANO F); | [A]US4168360 (D ALELIO GAETANO F) |