Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6923581 | Global Dossier | 11.09.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | US8100224 | 24.02.1981 | US12399080 | 25.02.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8107261 | 05.01.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US8100224 | 24.02.1981 | US12399080 | 25.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8102415 | Global Dossier | 03.09.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12399080 | 25.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0045807 | Global Dossier | 14.02.1983 | A4 | EP0045807 | 17.02.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12399080 | 25.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1151087 | 02.08.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US12399080 | 25.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS57500284 | 18.02.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US12399080 | 25.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX152029 | 24.05.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US12399080 | 25.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4324340 | 13.04.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US12399080 | 25.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA811270 | 31.03.1982 | B | Priority number | Date | US12399080 | 25.02.1980 |