EP0048257 - PROCEDURE FOR IMPRIVING THE ECOLOGICAL STATE OF A THERMALLY AND/OR CHEMICALLY STRATIFIED WATER BASIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.1982 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.1982 [1982/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAPPALAINEN, Kalle Matti Kirnukuja 6 B 4 SF-70780 Kuopio 78 / FI | For all designated states ORAVAINEN, Reijo Matti Märventie 2 D 31 36240 Nattari / FI | For all designated states SOLIN, Ami Soinilankatu 30 D 13 SF-33730 Tampere 73 / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | For all designated states LAPPALAINEN, Kalle Matti Kirnukuja 6 B 4 SF-70780 Kuopio 78 / FI | ||
For all designated states ORAVAINEN, Reijo Matti Märventie 2 D 31 SF-36240 Nattari / FI | |||
For all designated states SOLIN, Ami Soinilankatu 30 D 13 SF-33730 Tampere 73 / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/13] | Application number, filing date | 81900822.8 | 27.03.1981 | [1982/13] | WO1981FI00024 | Priority number, date | FI19800000990 | 28.03.1980 Original published format: FI 800990 | [1982/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8102731 | Date: | 01.10.1981 | [1981/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048257 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/13] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | C02F7/00, B01F3/04 | [1982/13] | CPC: |
C02F3/1284 (EP);
B01F23/23341 (EP);
C02F1/645 (EP);
C02F7/00 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERBESSERN DES ÖKOLOGISCHEN ZUSTANDS EINES THERMISCH UND/ODER CHEMISCH GESCHICHTETEN WASSERBECKENS | [1982/13] | English: | PROCEDURE FOR IMPRIVING THE ECOLOGICAL STATE OF A THERMALLY AND/OR CHEMICALLY STRATIFIED WATER BASIN | [1982/13] | French: | PROCESSUS PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER L'ETAT ECOLOGIQUE D'UN BASSIN D'EAU THERMIQUEMENT ET/OU CHIMIQUEMENT STRATIFIE | [1982/13] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 26.03.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1982/36] | 26.05.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.12.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1981 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1981 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1981 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 24.12.1981 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1981 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE2350467 [ ] (HAGSTOTZ WILHELM); | DE1928730 [ ] (INST WASSERWIRTSCHAFT); | GB1326457 [ ]; | GB1534209 [ ]; | GB1239727 [ ]; | DE2507698 [ ] (LINDE AG); | GB2013095 [ ] (BOC LTD) |