EP0057727 - HANDRAIL COPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Naka Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1020-178 Hassamu, Nishi-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | [1982/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKA, Hiromitsu Tokyo Kenkyusho of K.K. Naka Gijutsu Kenkyusho 39 Oaza Shinmachi, Yashio-shi Saitama-ken 340 / JP | 02 /
MIYASHIRO, Takeshi Tokyo Kenkyusho of K.K. Naka Gijutsu Kenkyusho 39 Oaza Shinmachi, Yashio-shi Saitama-ken 340 / JP | 03 /
SUGIMOTO, Yoshihide Tokyo Kenkyusho of K.K. Naka Gijutsu Kenkyusho 39 Oaza Shinmachi, Yashio-shi Saitama-ken 340 / JP | [1982/33] | Representative(s) | Brooke-Smith, Fred, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | [1982/33] | Application number, filing date | 81900956.4 | 21.04.1981 | [1982/33] | WO1981JP00095 | Priority number, date | JP19800051625 | 21.04.1980 Original published format: JP 5162580 | [1982/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8103042 | Date: | 29.10.1981 | [1981/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057727 | Date: | 18.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/18 | [1982/33] | CPC: |
E04F11/184 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24983 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/33] | Title | German: | HANDLAUFÜBERZUG | [1982/33] | English: | HANDRAIL COPING | [1982/33] | French: | ENROBAGE DE MAIN COURANTE | [1982/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.1982 | Translation filed | 20.01.1982 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1982 | Search fee paid | 20.01.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/33] | 08.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 17.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/44] | 03.06.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1988/44] | Appeal following examination | 26.12.1986 | Appeal received | 21.02.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.07.1987 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.1986 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2206771 [ ] (DIVERSEY FRANCE [FR]); | CH598447 [ ] (JOERG HEINRICH); | LU81452 [ ] (HAMM W [DE]) | International search | [E]JPS55108127U |