EP0078255 - OPTICAL MEASURING MEMBER FOR DETERMINING THE DIAMETER OF THREADS AND WIRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/19] | OPTICAL MEASURING MEMBER FOR THREADS AND WIRES | ||
[1985/48] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.07.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZELLWEGER USTER AG Wilstrasse 11 CH-8610 Uster / CH | [1983/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AEPPLI, Kurt Grundstrasse 4 CH-8610 Uster / CH | [1983/19] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/13] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/19] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys.Rotermund B.Sc. Morgan, Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81901531.4 | 10.06.1981 | [1983/19] | WO1981CH00064 | Priority number, date | CH19810003181 | 15.05.1981 Original published format: CH 318181 | [1983/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8204117 | Date: | 25.11.1982 | [1982/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078255 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078255 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0078255 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/10 | [1983/19] | CPC: |
G01B11/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/19] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES MESSORGAN ZUR QUERSCHNITTSBESTIMMUNG VON FÄDEN UND DRÄHTEN | [1985/48] | English: | OPTICAL MEASURING MEMBER FOR DETERMINING THE DIAMETER OF THREADS AND WIRES | [1985/48] | French: | ORGANE DE MESURE OPTIQUE POUR LA DETERMINATION DE DIAMETRES DE FILS ET CABLES | [1985/48] |
Former [1983/19] | OPTISCHES MESSORGAN FÜR FÄDEN UND DRÄHTE | ||
Former [1983/19] | OPTICAL MEASURING MEMBER FOR THREADS AND WIRES | ||
Former [1983/19] | ORGANE DE MESURE OPTIQUE POUR FILS ET CABLES | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1982 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/19] | 26.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.07.1986
20.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE W. Schlafhorst & Co. Blumenberger Strasse 143 - 145 D-41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | [1986/39] | 02.10.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.02.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.03.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 30.04.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 04.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 05.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.05.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.06.1989 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.09.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.09.1989 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.05.1990 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2641960 (STROTHER FRED P); | [X]US3582661 (PIJLS HERMANUS STEPHANUS JOSEP); | [X]US3900730 (GITH WALTER); | DE2818789 [ ] (SCHULZ WOLFGANG DIPL PHYS DR I) | Opposition | DE2337413 |