Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
14.07.1990 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 29.08.1990 [1990/35] |
17.02.1987 | Change - representative | published on 08.04.1987 [1987/15] |
04.02.1987 | Change - representative | published on 25.03.1987 [1987/13] |
06.08.1986 | Opposition filed | published on 24.09.1986 [1986/39] |
27.09.1985 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.11.1985 [1985/48] |
12.03.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.05.1983 [1983/19] |
12.03.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.05.1983 [1983/19] |