EP0053157 - METHOD OF MAKING BOATHULLS, VEHICLE BODIES, CONTAINERS AND SIMILAR SHELL STRUCTURES, AND A TUBE LATTICE FOR USE IN MAKING SUCH STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAFF ENTREPRISER AS Röslyngv. 4A N-Oslo 3 / NO | [1982/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAFF, Thore Röslyngv. 4A N-Oslo 3 / NO | [1982/23] | Representative(s) | Haggart, John Pawson, et al Page, White & Farrer 5 Plough Place New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1HY / GB | [1982/23] | Application number, filing date | 81901554.6 | 10.06.1981 | [1982/23] | WO1981NO00022 | Priority number, date | NO19800001723 | 10.06.1980 Original published format: NO 801723 | [1982/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8103640 | Date: | 24.12.1981 | [1981/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053157 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053157 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/20, F16S1/00, B63B5/24, E04C2/34 | [1982/41] | CPC: |
B32B5/20 (EP,US);
B29C44/186 (EP);
B32B3/20 (US);
B63B5/24 (EP);
B29L2031/30 (EP);
B29L2031/307 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1982/23] | B23B5/20, F16S1/00, B63B5/24, E04C2/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHIFFSKÖRPERN, AUTOKARROSSERIEN, BEHÄLTERN UND ÄHNLICHEN SCHALENSTRUKTUREN UND ROHRGITTER ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER HERSTELLUNG SOLCHER STRUKTUREN | [1982/23] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING BOATHULLS, VEHICLE BODIES, CONTAINERS AND SIMILAR SHELL STRUCTURES, AND A TUBE LATTICE FOR USE IN MAKING SUCH STRUCTURES | [1982/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE COQUES DE BATEAU, DE CARROSSERIES DE VEHICULE, DE CONTAINERS ET DE STRUCTURES DE COQUE SEMBLABLES, ET TREILLIS DE TUBES UTILISE DANS LA FABRICATION DE CES STRUCTURES | [1982/23] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.1982 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/51] | 22.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 15.10.1982 | Date of receipt | 04.11.1982 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.01.1987 | CH | 07.01.1987 | FR | 07.01.1987 | LI | 07.01.1987 | NL | 07.01.1987 | SE | 31.01.1987 | [2002/24] |
Former [1989/23] | AT | 07.01.1987 | |
CH | 07.01.1987 | ||
LI | 07.01.1987 | ||
NL | 07.01.1987 | ||
SE | 31.01.1987 | ||
Former [1989/17] | AT | 07.01.1987 | |
NL | 07.01.1987 | ||
SE | 31.01.1987 | ||
Former [1989/12] | AT | 07.01.1987 | |
NL | 07.01.1987 | ||
Former [1988/43] | NL | 07.01.1987 | Cited in | International search | US2446860 [ ] (WALLACE MILTON A); | GB820966 [ ] (MONSANTO CHEMICALS); | DE1659053 [ ] (CONTRAVES AG); | DE2117166 [ ] (DUMONT & BESSON) |