EP0060254 - SAFETY BELT BUCKLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STIL-INDUSTRI AB P.O. Box 104 S-447 00 Värgärda / SE | [1982/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGLUND, Lennart Korsnäbbgatan 5 S-447 00 Värgärda / SE | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Sigvard Pl. 1078, Degrabo S-447 00 Värgärda / SE | [1982/38] | Representative(s) | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/38] | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188 S-203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 81901671.8 | 15.06.1981 | [1982/38] | WO1981SE00178 | Priority number, date | SE19800004462 | 16.06.1980 Original published format: SE 8004462 | [1982/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8103603 | Date: | 24.12.1981 | [1981/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060254 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060254 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/52] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A44B11/25, A44B11/00 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
A44B11/2523 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45639 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45665 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45686 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45785 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/38] | Title | German: | SCHNALLE FÜR SICHERHEITSGURTE | [1982/38] | English: | SAFETY BELT BUCKLE | [1982/38] | French: | BOUCLE DE CEINTURE DE SECURITE | [1982/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.1982 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1982 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 12.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/38] | 27.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1985 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.1985 | CH | 27.12.1985 | LI | 27.12.1985 | NL | 27.12.1985 | SE | 31.01.1986 | LU | 30.06.1986 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/20] | AT | 27.12.1985 | |
CH | 27.12.1985 | ||
LI | 27.12.1985 | ||
NL | 27.12.1985 | ||
SE | 31.01.1986 | ||
Former [1989/14] | AT | 27.12.1985 | |
NL | 27.12.1985 | ||
SE | 31.01.1986 | ||
Former [1988/23] | AT | 27.12.1985 | |
NL | 27.12.1985 | ||
Former [1987/19] | AT | 27.12.1985 | Cited in | International search | SE409407 [ ] (PEUGEOT ACIERS ET OUTILLAGE [FR]); | DE2828082 [ ] (STAHL GURT BANDWEBEREI); | EP0011275 [ ] (WALL LTD HOWARD [GB]) | Examination | - CANCER RESEARCH (1979) 39 3509-35 |