EP0079885 - POWER SUPPLY CONTROL FOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.02.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOSTEK CORPORATION 1215 West Crosby Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | [1983/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASWELL, Cecil James 308 Briarcove Coppell, TX 75019 / US | [1983/22] | Representative(s) | Huber, Arnulf Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Huber, Arnulf Uexküll & Stolberg, Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 81901842.5 | 27.05.1981 | [1983/22] | WO1981US00705 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8204345 | Date: | 09.12.1982 | [1982/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079885 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/40 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
G06F1/28 (EP,US);
G11C5/00 (EP,US);
G11C5/141 (EP,US);
Y10S331/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/22] | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSSTEUEREINHEIT FÜR INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG | [1983/22] | English: | POWER SUPPLY CONTROL FOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT | [1983/22] | French: | COMMANDE DE L'ALIMENTATION ELECTRIQUE POUR UN CIRCUIT INTEGRE | [1983/22] | File destroyed: | 10.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1983 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.1983 | Search fee paid | 22.01.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/32] | 30.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1987/15] | 31.10.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1984 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3483393 (GUTZMER ALFRED N, et al); | [A]FR2347809 (ACCUMULATEURS FIXES [FR]) | [A] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, vol. 26, no. 10, May 1978, page 130, Rochelle Park, US | International search | [A]US3859638 (HUME JR ALFRED S); | [A]US3980935 (WORST BERNARD I); | [A]US4209850 (KUSUMOTO TADAO [JP], et al) |