EP0083338 - COMPOSITION FOR INCREASING BLOOD PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/28] | PROCESS AND COMPOSITION FOR INCREASING BLOOD PRESSURE | ||
[1987/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.1988 [1988/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WURTMAN, Richard J. 193 Marlborough Street Boston, MA 02116 / US | [1983/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/28] | Representative(s) | Holdcroft, James Gerald, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/28] | Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr., et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 81902147.8 | 15.07.1981 | [1983/28] | WO1981US00964 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8300285 | Date: | 03.02.1983 | [1983/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0083338 | Date: | 13.07.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083338 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K31/195, A61K33/14 | [1983/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K33/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/195, A61K31/135 (EP);
A61K33/14, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/14, A61K31/195 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1983/28] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES BLUTDRUCKS | [1987/42] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR INCREASING BLOOD PRESSURE | [1987/42] | French: | COMPOSITION PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA PRESSION SANGUINE | [1987/42] |
Former [1983/28] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES BLUTDRUCKS | ||
Former [1983/28] | PROCESS AND COMPOSITION FOR INCREASING BLOOD PRESSURE | ||
Former [1983/28] | PROCEDE ET COMPOSITION PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA PRESSION SANGUINE | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1983 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1983 | Search fee paid | 18.03.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/38] | 23.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3651237 [ ] (LABORIT HENRI); | EP0005057 [ ] (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]); | EP0005058 [ ] (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]); | US4327112 [ ] (WURTMAN RICHARD J) | International search | [X]FR2034543 (ETD EXPERIMENTALES CENTRE); | [A]US4224343 (WURTMAN RICHARD J) | [X] - Science, Vol. 212, issued 1 May 1981, (Washington, D.C., USA) L.A. CONLAY, "Tyrosine Increases Blood Pressure in Hypotensive Rats", pp. 559-560. | [X] - Science, Vol. 211, issued 13 February 1981, (Washington, D.C., USA) N.A. SCOTT, "Tyrosine Administration Decreases Vulnerability to Ventricular Fibrillation in the Normal Canine Heart", pp. 727-729. | [X] - P.B. BEESON (Ed), "Cecil-Textbook of Medicine", published 1979 by W.B. SAUNDERS Company (Philadelphia, PA), see page 1048. | [X] - L.S. GOODMAN (Ed), "The Pharmaceutical Basis of Therapeutics", 5th Edition, issued 1975 by MacMILLAN Publishing Co. (New York, N.Y.), see pages 477-487, 490-492, 494, 495, 500, 501, 503, 506, 507. | [X] - New England Journal of Medicine issued 3 October 1974 (Boston, MA, USA) L.I. GOLDBERG, Medical Intelligence-Drug Therapy," Dopamine-Clinical Uses of an Endogenous Catecholamine", pp. 707-710. | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 78, No. 9, issued 5 March 1973 (Columbus, Ohio, USA) The Abstract No. 52807y, H. ACHARA, "Effect of Dopamine on Peripheral Vasculature of the Rat" Jap. J. Pharmacol., 1972, 22(5) 617-27 (Eng.) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 83, No. 23, issued 8 December 1975 (Columbus, Ohio, USA) The Abstract No. 188282j, T. FURUKAWA, "Synergistic Effects of Ephedrine, Tyramine and Norepinephrine on the Action of Dopanine on Blood", Nippon Yakurigaku Zasshi, 1974, 70(3), 377-84 (Japan). | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 92, No. 15, issued 14 April 1980, (Columbus, Ohio, USA) The Abstract No. 92:122042k, R.J. WURTMAN, "Material and Composition for Reducing Blood Pressure", Eur Pat. Appl 5,057, 31 October 1979. | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 93, No. 7, issued 18 August 1980 (Columbus, Ohio, USA) The Abstract No. 93:69326, E. MELAMED, "Plasma Tyrosine in normal Humans: Effects of Oral Tyrosine and Protein - Containing Meals", Neural. Transm. 1980, 47(4), pp. 299-306 (Eng). | Examination | - Agressologie 1969, 10(3), pages 199 - 215 |