EP0057693 - COUNTERCURRENT FLOW ABSORBER AND DESORBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1982 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 505 King Avenue Columbus Ohio 43201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/33] | For all designated states BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 505 King Avenue Columbus Ohio 43201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILKINSON, William H. 1828 Arlington Avenue Columbus, OH 43212 / US | [1982/33] | Application number, filing date | 81902208.8 | 03.08.1981 | [1982/33] | WO1981US01040 | Priority number, date | US19800177695 | 13.08.1980 Original published format: US 177695 | [1982/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8200597 | Date: | 04.03.1982 | [1982/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057693 | Date: | 18.08.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/33] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04 | [1982/33] | CPC: |
F25B33/00 (EP);
F25B37/00 (EP);
Y02A30/27 (EP);
Y02B30/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/33] | Title | German: | GEGENSTROMABSORBIER- UND -DESORBIERVORRICHTUNG | [1982/33] | English: | COUNTERCURRENT FLOW ABSORBER AND DESORBER | [1982/33] | French: | APPAREILS D'ABSORPTION ET DE DESORPTION A ECOULEMENT A CONTRE-COURANT | [1982/33] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 12.08.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1983/03] | 12.10.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.05.1982 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1982 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1982 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1982 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1982 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1982 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1982 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1982 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2356530 (RUDOLF PFLOCK); | [X]US600298 ; | [X]US2601493 (BARR JOHN L); | [A]US735376 (HOBART FRANKLIN GATFIELD [US]); | [A]US898935 (SLADEK ALBERT J [US]); | [A]US1975267 (GOLDTHWAITE GEORGE R); | [A]US2178883 (SIEDLE ARNOLD D); | [A]US3291568 (SANTTER RICHARD D); | [A]US3894133 (COSTE ANGELO C) |