Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] |
14.11.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.12.1986 [1986/52] |
11.06.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.08.1982 [1982/32] |
11.06.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.08.1982 [1982/32] |