Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3175768D1 | 05.02.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US17703980 | 11.08.1980 | US8101053 | 06.08.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK161282 | 07.04.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US17703980 | 11.08.1980 | US8101053 | 06.08.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO156104C | 05.08.1987 | C | NO156104B | 13.04.1987 | B | NO821188L | 07.04.1982 | L | Priority number | Date | US17703980 | 11.08.1980 | US8101053 | 06.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8200515 | Global Dossier | 18.02.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17703980 | 11.08.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0057235 | Global Dossier | 30.12.1986 | B1 | EP0057235 | 24.04.1984 | A4 | EP0057235 | 11.08.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17703980 | 11.08.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE889937 | 01.12.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | US17703980 | 11.08.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL63544 | 31.07.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US17703980 | 11.08.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1137866 | 10.09.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | US17703980 | 11.08.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR830008154 | 16.11.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US17703980 | 11.08.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4386848 | 07.06.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US17703980 | 11.08.1980 |