EP0057235 - OPTICAL TARGET TRACKING AND DESIGNATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martin Marietta Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda Maryland 20817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | For all designated states Martin Marietta Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda Maryland 20817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLENDENIN, Ralph M. 4232 Barwood Drive Orlando, FL 32805 / US | 02 /
FREEMAN, Raymonds 1047 35th Street Orlando, FL 32805 / US | [1982/32] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 81902512.3 | 06.08.1981 | [1982/32] | WO1981US01053 | Priority number, date | US19800177039 | 11.08.1980 Original published format: US 177039 | [1982/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8200515 | Date: | 18.02.1982 | [1982/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057235 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057235 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01C3/08, G01B11/26, H04N7/16, F41G7/26 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
F41G3/22 (EP,US);
F41G5/14 (KR);
F41G3/165 (EP,US);
F41H5/266 (EP,US);
G01S17/66 (EP,US);
G01S3/7864 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/32] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE ANORDNUNG ZUM ANWEISEN UND FOLGEN EINES ZIELES | [1982/32] | English: | OPTICAL TARGET TRACKING AND DESIGNATING SYSTEM | [1982/32] | French: | SYSTEME DE DESIGNATION ET DE POURSUITE D'UNE CIBLE OPTIQUE | [1982/32] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.1982 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.1982 | Search fee paid | 01.04.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/32] | 25.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1984 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed | International search | [X]US3631775 (TIDD JAMES A); | [X]US3715953 (ALLAN W); | [A]US3742812 (WOODWORTH W, et al); | [A]DE2322631 (AEROSPATIALE); | [A]US3833282 (KAPPL G, et al); | [X]US3926525 (SHELDRICK GEORGE EDWARD); | [A]US4027968 (SPENCE-BATE HARRY ARTHUR HELE); | [X]US4108551 (WEBER CLAUDE EDMOND GEORGES); | [A]US4155096 (BEAUREGARD JOHN G [US], et al); | [A]US4173414 (DE PONTEVES DOMINIQUE [FR], et al); | [A]US4195799 (SOGO HIROSHI [JP], et al) |