EP0059214 - SHAPED CEMENTITIOUS PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.1986 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A/S NIRO ATOMIZER No. 305 Gladsaxevej DK-2680 Soeborg / DK | [1984/24] |
Former [1982/36] | For all designated states NIRO ATOMIZERINC. 9165 Rumsey Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCHMANN, John C. 10170 Goodin Circle Columbia, MD 21046 / US | 02 /
RASMUSSEN, Elisabeth L. 128 Ronnebaervej DK-2840 Holte / DK | 03 /
WEBSTER, William C. 3008 Potshop Road Norristown, PA 19403 / US | 04 /
VELTMAN, Preston L. 212 Old County Road Severna Park, MD 21146 / US | [1982/36] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [1982/36] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Ruhrstrasse 26 Postfach 2448 D-58414 Witten / DE | Application number, filing date | 81902538.8 | 04.09.1981 | [1982/36] | WO1981US01185 | Priority number, date | US19800184069 | 04.09.1980 Original published format: US 184069 | [1982/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8200819 | Date: | 18.03.1982 | [1982/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059214 | Date: | 08.09.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059214 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C04B7/00 | [1982/36] | CPC: |
C04B18/062 (EP,US);
C04B18/021 (EP,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US);
Y10S588/901 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B18/062, C04B18/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, NL, SE [1982/36] | Title | German: | GEFORMTE ZEMENTPRODUKTE | [1982/36] | English: | SHAPED CEMENTITIOUS PRODUCTS | [1982/36] | French: | PRODUITS DE CIMENT EN FORME | [1982/36] | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1982 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1982 | Search fee paid | 24.04.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/45] | 14.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1983 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3852084 (WEBSTER W, et al); | [A]US4101332 (NICHOLSON JOHN PATRICK); | [P]US4226630 (STYRON ROBERT W) | Examination | US3634115 | US3861930 | DE2400350 | FR2386336 | US4171951 | EP0022318 |