EP0060299 - MULTIPLE SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD AND SYSTEM, PARTICULARLY FOR TELEVISION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAAST, INC. 12555 W. Jefferson Blvd. Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | [1990/09] |
Former [1982/38] | For all designated states TELEASE INC. 1875 Century Park East Suite 930 Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIELD, Robert W. 9458 El Pueblo Fountain Valley, CA 92708 / US | 02 /
GERLACH, Ronald R. 28482 Casanal Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | 03 /
PERR, Clarence D. 1608 Birchcrest Circle Brea, CA 92621 / US | 04 /
BLOCK, Robert S. 13044 Mindanao Way, 5 Marina Del Ray, CA 90291 / US | [1982/38] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Roger, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1989/16] |
Former [1982/38] | Haggart, John Pawson Page, White & Farrer 5 Plough Place New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 81902706.1 | 18.09.1981 | [1982/38] | WO1981US01261 | Priority number, date | US19800188738 | 19.09.1980 Original published format: US 188738 | [1982/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201109 | Date: | 01.04.1982 | [1982/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060299 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060299 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04K1/00 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
H04K1/00 (EP,US);
H04N7/06 (EP,US);
H04N7/167 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/38] | Title | German: | MEHRFACHES SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN, INSBESONDERE FÜR DAS FERNSEHEN | [1982/38] | English: | MULTIPLE SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD AND SYSTEM, PARTICULARLY FOR TELEVISION | [1982/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX MULTIPLES, EN PARTICULIER POUR LA TELEVISION | [1982/38] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/01: Divisional application 88201597 filed on 25.07.88 | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.1982 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.1982 | Search fee paid | 10.05.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/50] | 23.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88201597.7 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 26.08.1988 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.1990 | CH | 03.01.1990 | LI | 03.01.1990 | NL | 03.01.1990 | SE | 03.01.1990 | LU | 30.09.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1990/52] | AT | 03.01.1990 | |
CH | 03.01.1990 | ||
LI | 03.01.1990 | ||
NL | 03.01.1990 | ||
SE | 03.01.1990 | ||
Former [1990/43] | CH | 03.01.1990 | |
LI | 03.01.1990 | ||
NL | 03.01.1990 | ||
SE | 03.01.1990 | ||
Former [1990/34] | CH | 03.01.1990 | |
LI | 03.01.1990 | ||
SE | 03.01.1990 | ||
Former [1990/31] | CH | 03.01.1990 | |
LI | 03.01.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1101257 (RADIOTECHNIQUE); | [Y]US3809817 (GILL W, et al); | [Y]US3059054 (REITER ABRAHAM M); | [X]FR1107198 (ELECTRONIQUE & PHYSIQUE); | [X]US3221098 (FELDMAN EUGENE S, et al); | [X]US3795764 (ALTMANN A) | International search | [X]US3824332 (HOROWITZ I); | [X]US3809817 (GILL W, et al); | [X]US3059054 (REITER ABRAHAM M); | [X]US2952735 (WEISS PHIL H); | [X]US3104280 (AKRELL CARL A S) |