EP0070279 - PRESSURIZED GAS DRIVEN SOUND EMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOCKUMATION AB P.O. Box 1044 S-212 10 Malmö / SE | [1983/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERTHAJM, Marek Gunnarstorpsgatan 13 S-216 22 Malmö / SE | 02 /
JÖNSSON, Tommy Vikengatan 5 C S-244 02 Furulund / SE | [1983/04] | Representative(s) | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188 S-203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [1983/04] | Ström, Tore Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188 S-203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 81902856.4 | 15.10.1981 | [1983/04] | WO1981SE00302 | Priority number, date | SE19800007294 | 17.10.1980 Original published format: SE 8007294 | [1983/04] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201329 | Date: | 29.04.1982 | [1982/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0070279 | Date: | 26.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0070279 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/20, F15C4/00 | [1983/04] | CPC: |
G10K5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/04] | Title | German: | VON HOCHDRUCKGAS GETRIEBENER SCHALLSTRAHLER | [1986/13] | English: | PRESSURIZED GAS DRIVEN SOUND EMITTER | [1983/04] | French: | EMETTEUR SONORE EXCITE PAR UN GAZ SOUS PRESSION | [1983/04] |
Former [1983/04] | VON HOCHDRUCKGAS GETRIEBENER SCHALLAUSTRAHLER | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1982 | Translation filed | 11.11.1982 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.1982 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 24.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.09.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.1986 | CH | 26.03.1986 | FR | 26.03.1986 | LI | 26.03.1986 | NL | 26.03.1986 | SE | 16.10.1986 | LU | 31.10.1986 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 26.03.1986 | |
CH | 26.03.1986 | ||
LI | 26.03.1986 | ||
NL | 26.03.1986 | ||
GB | 15.10.1986 | ||
SE | 16.10.1986 | ||
LU | 31.10.1986 | ||
Former [1989/28] | AT | 26.03.1986 | |
CH | 26.03.1986 | ||
LI | 26.03.1986 | ||
NL | 26.03.1986 | ||
GB | 15.10.1986 | ||
SE | 16.10.1986 | ||
Former [1989/21] | AT | 26.03.1986 | |
CH | 26.03.1986 | ||
LI | 26.03.1986 | ||
NL | 26.03.1986 | ||
SE | 16.10.1986 | ||
Former [1989/16] | AT | 26.03.1986 | |
NL | 26.03.1986 | ||
SE | 16.10.1986 | ||
Former [1988/26] | AT | 26.03.1986 | |
NL | 26.03.1986 | ||
Former [1987/20] | AT | 26.03.1986 | Cited in | International search | US3111931 [ ] (BODINE ALBERT G); | DE1181591 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | CH491459 [ ] (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | SE330845 [ ] (IMP RIV SRL [IT]); | US3701334 [ ] (TEITELBAUM BERNARD R); | US4194095 [ ] (DOI TOSHITADA [JP], et al); | EP0012070 [ ] (BERTIN & CIE [FR]) | Examination | SE193387 | US1530899 | DE1235775 | US3416487 | DE1433147 | US3850135 | US3911858 | US3942468 |