EP0064532 - A WEATHER STRIP AND A REINFORCING LAYER FOR USE IN MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KISO KEMI A/S Falkevej 9 DK-4600 Koge / DK | [1982/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALNAES, Povl Anna Sophies Vej 2 DK-4681 Herfolge / DK | [1982/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81903137.8 | 20.11.1981 | [1982/46] | WO1981DK00105 | Priority number, date | DK19800004990 | 21.11.1980 Original published format: DK 499080 | [1982/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201735 | Date: | 27.05.1982 | [1982/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0064532 | Date: | 17.11.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/46] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/23 | [1982/46] | CPC: |
E06B7/2314 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/46] | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSSTREIFEN UND VERSTÄRKUNGSSCHICHT ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1982/46] | English: | A WEATHER STRIP AND A REINFORCING LAYER FOR USE IN MAKING THE SAME | [1982/46] | French: | BOURRELET ETANCHE ET COUCHE DE RENFORCEMENT UTILISEE DANS LA FABRICATION DE CE BOURRELET ETANCHE | [1982/46] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1982 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/49] | 02.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/30] | 14.02.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB913132 ; | [Y]GB1362787 ; | [A]FR1442850 ; | [A]US4084348 |