EP0065553 - PROCESS FOR THE REFRIGERATION OF LIQUIDS AND/OR GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1983 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.1983 [1983/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABRAMO, Carlos Alberto Dawes Av. Almirante Ary Parreiras 337 Apt. 201 Icarai CEP 24.230 Niteroi Rio de Janeiro / BR | [1982/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/48] | Application number, filing date | 81903264.0 | 25.11.1981 | [1982/48] | WO1981BR00010 | Priority number, date | BR19808007709 | 26.11.1980 Original published format: BR 8007709 | [1982/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201937 | Date: | 10.06.1982 | [1982/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065553 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/48] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/02 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
F28D7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM GEFRIEREN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN UND/ODER GASEN | [1982/48] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE REFRIGERATION OF LIQUIDS AND/OR GASES | [1982/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE REFRIGERATION DE LIQUIDES ET/OU DE GAZ | [1982/48] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 23.11.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1983/18] | 23.01.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.08.1982 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 26.08.1982 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 26.08.1982 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 26.08.1982 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 26.08.1982 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 26.08.1982 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 26.08.1982 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 26.08.1982 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB938372 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]DE1116247 (SCHMOELE METALL R & G); | [A]US2324707 (JOHNSON HERMAN K); | [A]US2430774 (LYNN FREDERICK E); | [A]US2621903 (COHLER IRVING H); | [A]US3269422 (MATTHEWS RICHARD A, et al) |