EP0056940 - Derivatives of phthalocyanine, color photographic material containing this derivative and the color photographic image containing the phthalocyanine dyestuff formed from the phthalocyanine derivative as image dye [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1985 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1985 [1985/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/31] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Melzer, Arnfried, Dr. Wolfskaul 12 D-5000 Koeln 80 / DE | 02 /
Vetter, Hans, Dr. Gerstenkamp 19 D-5000 Koeln 80 / DE | 03 /
Marx, Paul, Dr. Nauener Strasse 25 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 04 /
Jaeken, Jan, Dr. Guyoddrees Nr. 62 B-2130 Brasschaad / BE | 05 /
Janssens, Wilhelmus, Dr. Jan-van-Harcourtlaan 35 B-3220 Aarschot / BE | [1982/31] | Application number, filing date | 82100122.9 | 11.01.1982 | [1982/31] | Priority number, date | DE19813101036 | 15.01.1981 Original published format: DE 3101036 | [1982/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0056940 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0056940 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/54, C09B47/26, C07D487/22 | [1982/31] | CPC: |
G03C8/10 (EP);
C09B47/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1982/31] | Title | German: | Neue Phthalocyaninverbindungen, ein farbfotografisches Aufzeichnungsmaterial, das die neuen Phthalocyaninverbindungen enthält sowie ein farbfotografisches Bild, das aus den Phthalocyaninverbindungen freigesetzte Phthalocyaninfarbstoffe als Bildfarbstoffe enthält | [1982/31] | English: | Derivatives of phthalocyanine, color photographic material containing this derivative and the color photographic image containing the phthalocyanine dyestuff formed from the phthalocyanine derivative as image dye | [1982/31] | French: | Dérivés de phtacyanine, matériau de reproduction pour la photographie en couleurs qui contient ces dérivés ainsi qu'une image photographique en couleurs qui contient le colorant de phtalocyanine libéré par le dérivé de phtalocyanine comme colorant d'image | [1982/31] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 11.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/31] | 15.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2630999 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [YD]EP0004399 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) | [AD] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, Nr. 156, April 1977, Seiten 32-39, Zusammenfassung Nr. 15654, Industrial Opportunities Ltd., Van Hants, G.B. |