EP0060379 - Theft-preventing device for a radiator-valve thermostat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/38] | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 D-64295 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beer, Erich Bachstrasse 38 D-6418 Hünfeld / DE | [1982/38] | Application number, filing date | 82100219.3 | 14.01.1982 | [1982/38] | Priority number, date | DE19813109877 | 14.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3109877 | [1982/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0060379 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0060379 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060379 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16B41/00 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
F24D19/0002 (EP);
F16B41/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1982/38] | Title | German: | Diebstahlsicherung für Heizkörperventil-Thermostaten | [1982/38] | English: | Theft-preventing device for a radiator-valve thermostat | [1982/38] | French: | Dispositif anti-vol pour la valve-thermorégulatrice d'un radiateur | [1982/38] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/30] | 04.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.07.1986 | IT | 23.07.1986 | AT | 14.01.1987 | CH | 31.01.1987 | LI | 31.01.1987 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 23.07.1986 | |
AT | 14.01.1987 | ||
CH | 31.01.1987 | ||
LI | 31.01.1987 | ||
Former [1989/24] | AT | 14.01.1987 | |
CH | 31.01.1987 | ||
LI | 31.01.1987 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 14.01.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL74879C ; | [AD]DE7902690U ; | [AED]DE3102335 (WELLA AG [DE]) |