EP0059825 - Metal fastening element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1986 [1986/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states artur fischer forschung Weinhalde 14 - 18 D-7244 Waldachtal 3 (Tumlingen) / DE | [1982/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Artur, Dr. h.c. Weinhalde 34 D-7244 Waldachtal 3/Tumlingen / DE | [1982/37] | Application number, filing date | 82100239.1 | 14.01.1982 | [1982/37] | Priority number, date | DE19813108388 | 05.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3108388 | [1982/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059825 | Date: | 15.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059825 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/06 | [1982/37] | CPC: |
F16B13/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/37] | Title | German: | Befestigungselement aus Metall | [1982/37] | English: | Metal fastening element | [1982/37] | French: | Elément d'assemblage de métal | [1982/37] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/17] | 11.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AT310403B [ ] (HUYGMETAAL NV [NL]); | DE2922126 [ ] (BERNER ALBERT GMBH CO KG) | Examination | FR476982 | - Industrial Fasteners Handbook, 2nd Edition, Trade & Technical Press Ltd., S. 180 u. 183 |