EP0057825 - Process for the preparation of aliphatic cyclic carbonates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1985 [1985/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/33] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krimm, Heinrich, Dr. Heyenbaumstrasse 65 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Buysch, Hans-Josef, Dr. Brandenburger Strasse 28 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | [1982/33] | Application number, filing date | 82100284.7 | 16.01.1982 | [1982/33] | Priority number, date | DE19813103137 | 30.01.1981 Original published format: DE 3103137 | [1982/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057825 | Date: | 18.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057825 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D323/00 | [1982/33] | CPC: |
C07D323/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung aliphatischer cyclischer Kohlensäureester | [1982/33] | English: | Process for the preparation of aliphatic cyclic carbonates | [1982/33] | French: | Procédé de préparation de carbonates aliphatiques cycliques | [1982/33] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/33] | 09.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0013957 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0013958 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]DE1229101 (BAYER AG) |