EP0057426 - Device for the separation of grinding bodies and ground suspension in a wet grinding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreitner, Ludwig, Dr. Liebigstrasse 10 D-6148 Heppenheim / DE | 02 /
Klapper, Juergen Woehlerstrasse 17 G D-6701 Maxdorf / DE | 03 /
Schober, Horst Glashuettenstrasse 49 D-6754 Otterberg / DE | [1982/32] | Application number, filing date | 82100572.5 | 28.01.1982 | [1982/32] | Priority number, date | DE19813103662 | 04.02.1981 Original published format: DE 3103662 | [1982/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0057426 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0057426 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057426 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B02C17/16 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
B02C17/161 (EP,US);
B07B1/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/32] | Title | German: | Trennvorrichtung zum Trennen von Mahlkörpern und gemahlener Suspension in einer Nasszerkleinerungsmaschine | [1982/32] | English: | Device for the separation of grinding bodies and ground suspension in a wet grinding machine | [1982/32] | French: | Dispositif pour la séparation de corps broyeurs et de la suspension broyée dans une machine à broyage humide | [1982/32] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/09] | 07.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US65504 ; | [Y]DE2922122 (NETZSCH MASCHINENFABRIK); | [Y]US3567032 (KEMPER JAMES M); | [A]DE78027 ; | [A]FR1549238 ; | [A]FR2245414 (NETZSCH MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]) | [A] - ANNUAL REPORT OF THE COMMISSIONER OF PATENTS FOR THE YEAR 1867, Band I, Seite 863 und Band III, Seite 559 & US - A - 65 504 (EDWARD F. PRYOR) 04.06.1867, & US65504 A 00000000 |