EP0058369 - Feeding device for woodworking machine-tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1987 [1987/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OKOMA Maschinenfabrik GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 6 D-7082 Oberkochen / DE | [1982/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Büttner, Kurt Aalener Strasse 42 D-7082 Oberkochen / DE | [1982/34] | Representative(s) | Wehser, Wulf, et al Jabbusch, Wehser & Lauerwald Patentanwälte Roscherstrasse 12 30161 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/34] | Wehser, Wulf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jabbusch, Wehser & Lauerwald Patentanwälte Roscherstrasse 12 D-30161 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 82100899.2 | 08.02.1982 | [1982/34] | Priority number, date | DE19813105083 | 12.02.1981 Original published format: DE 3105083 | [1982/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0058369 | Date: | 25.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0058369 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0058369 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B27C1/12, B27B25/02, B23Q3/00 | [1982/34] | CPC: |
B27C1/12 (EP);
B27B25/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, FR, IT [1982/34] | Title | German: | Vorschubeinrichtung für Holzbearbeitungsmaschinen | [1982/34] | English: | Feeding device for woodworking machine-tools | [1982/34] | French: | Dispositif d'avance pour les machines-outils pour l'usinage du bois | [1982/34] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/39] | 24.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE880649 [ ] (BUERKLE & CO ROBERT); | CH323073 [ ] (BRUENDLER ARTHUR [CH]); | DE1079822 [ ] (REICH MASCHF GMBH KARL); | DE1081210 [ ] (REICH MASCHF GMBH KARL); | FR1494230 [ ] (GUILLIET ETS) |