EP0057941 - Heat transfer boiling surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Noranda Inc. 240 Hymos Boulevard Pointe Claire Quebec H9R 1G5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1982/33] | For all designated states Noranda Inc. 240 Hymos Boulevard Pointe Claire Quebec H9R 1G5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carnavos, Theodore C. 37 Whittlesey Drive Bethel, CT 06801 / US | [1982/33] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/33] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82100978.4 | 10.02.1982 | [1982/33] | Priority number, date | US19810233517 | 11.02.1981 Original published format: US 233517 | [1982/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0057941 | Date: | 18.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0057941 | Date: | 08.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F28F13/18, F28F1/12 | [1982/33] | CPC: |
F28F13/187 (EP);
F28F1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/33] | Title | German: | Wärmeübertragungsfläche für siedende Flüssigkeiten | [1982/33] | English: | Heat transfer boiling surface | [1982/33] | French: | Surface d'ébullition de transfert de chaleur | [1982/33] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 30.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/32] | 24.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1493922 (EURATOM, et al); | [A]US3602027 (KLUG WILLIAM A, et al); | [A]DE2043459 (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V); | [A]US3765192 (ROOT D); | [A]US3768290 (ZATELL V); | [A]US3850227 (FORD J); | [A]US3893322 (CAMPBELL BONNIE J, et al); | [X]US4040479 (CAMPBELL BONNIE J, et al); | [A]GB2013325 (WIELAND WERKE AG) |