EP0062740 - Vacuum cleaner housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1986 [1986/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH Mühlenweg 17-37 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | For all designated states Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH Mühlenweg 17-35 D-42275 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gühne, Wieland Fürberg 13a D-5630 Remscheid / DE | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | Rieder, Hans-Joachim, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Postfach 11 04 51 42304 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | Rieder, Hans-Joachim, Dr., et al Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 11 04 51 D-42304 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 82100987.5 | 11.02.1982 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | DE19813114752 | 11.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3114752 | [1982/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0062740 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0062740 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0062740 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/00 | [1982/42] | CPC: |
A47L9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1982/42] | Title | German: | Staubsaugergehäuse | [1985/17] | English: | Vacuum cleaner housing | [1982/42] | French: | Boîtier d'un aspirateur de poussières | [1982/42] |
Former [1982/42] | Staubsaugergehäuser | Examination procedure | 14.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 15.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1087547 (TORNADO A G); | [Y]DE2525920 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]DE2627560 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [Y]FR2389359 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) |