EP0059355 - Use of reactive dyestuffs in dyeing and printing of hydroxylgroups containing fibrous materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/36] | Reactive dyestuffs, process for their preparation and their use in dyeing or printing fibrous materials | ||
[1986/37] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/36] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jäger, Horst, Dr. Carl-Rumpff-Strasse 37 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Schündehütte, Karl Heinz, Dr. Klief 75 D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | 03 /
Kalk, Walter, Dr. Klaasbruch 22 D-5090 Leverkusen 31 / DE | [1982/36] | Application number, filing date | 82101089.9 | 15.02.1982 | [1982/36] | Priority number, date | DE19813107265 | 26.02.1981 Original published format: DE 3107265 | [1982/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0059355 | Date: | 08.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0059355 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/08, D06P3/66 | [1986/37] | CPC: |
C09B62/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/36] | C09B62/04, D06P3/66, D06P3/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1982/36] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Reaktivfarbstoffen zum Färben und Bedrucken von hydroxylgruppenhaltigen Fasermaterialien | [1986/37] | English: | Use of reactive dyestuffs in dyeing and printing of hydroxylgroups containing fibrous materials | [1986/37] | French: | Utilisation de colorants réactifs pour la teinture et l'impression de matières fibreuses contenant des groupes hydroxyl | [1986/37] |
Former [1982/36] | Reaktivfarbstoffe, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung zum Färben oder Bedrucken von Fasermaterialien | ||
Former [1982/36] | Reactive dyestuffs, process for their preparation and their use in dyeing or printing fibrous materials | ||
Former [1982/36] | Colorants réactifs, leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation pour la teinture ou l'impression de matières fibreuses | File destroyed: | 02.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 15.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/36] | 13.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 29.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0022209 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]GB951667 (ICI LTD); | [A]GB1027570 (GEIGY AG J R); | [A]FR2366405 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]DE1146064 (CIBA GEIGY) |