EP0059363 - Salt mixture, process for its production and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 253 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/36] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möschl, Gernot Falltorstrasse 20 D-6108 Weiterstadt 2 / DE | 02 /
Vogel, Roland, Dr. Hebbelstrasse 4 D-6100 Darmstadt-Arheilgen / DE | 03 /
Härtner, Hartmut, Dr. Mathildenweg 9 D-6109 Mühltal 4 / DE | [1982/36] | Application number, filing date | 82101118.6 | 16.02.1982 | [1982/36] | Priority number, date | DE19813107800 | 28.02.1981 Original published format: DE 3107800 | [1982/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059363 | Date: | 08.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059363 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/237 | [1982/36] | CPC: |
A23L27/40 (EP);
A23L27/235 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/36] | Title | German: | Salzgemisch, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Verwendung | [1982/36] | English: | Salt mixture, process for its production and use | [1982/36] | French: | Mélange du sel, procédé pour sa fabrication et son utilisation | [1982/36] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 20.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.12.1984 | FR | 05.12.1984 | NL | 05.12.1984 | AT | 16.02.1985 | SE | 17.02.1985 | CH | 28.02.1985 | LI | 28.02.1985 | [2002/24] |
Former [1989/19] | BE | 05.12.1984 | |
NL | 05.12.1984 | ||
AT | 16.02.1985 | ||
SE | 17.02.1985 | ||
CH | 28.02.1985 | ||
LI | 28.02.1985 | ||
Former [1988/13] | BE | 05.12.1984 | |
NL | 05.12.1984 | ||
AT | 16.02.1985 | ||
SE | 17.02.1985 | ||
Former [1987/19] | BE | 05.12.1984 | |
NL | 05.12.1984 | ||
AT | 16.02.1985 | ||
Former [1986/15] | BE | 05.12.1984 | |
NL | 05.12.1984 | ||
Former [1986/11] | BE | 05.12.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | FR1159060 [ ] (MEAD JOHNSON & CO); | GB1275540 [ ] (CUMBERLAND PACKING CORP [US]); | US4243691 [ ] (MOHLENKAMP JR MARVIN J, et al) | [ ] - Research Disclosure, Nr. 207, Juli 1981, Havant Hampshire, England Referat Nr. 20729 "Sodium-Free Salt Substitute" seiten 262 und 263 |