EP0059881 - Ribbed tick and bedding article comprising such ribbed tick and at least two insulating fillers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1983 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDISK FJER SENGE- OG BOLIGUDSTYR A/S (NORDISK FJERFABRIK A/S) Sjaellandsvej 2 DK-5500 Middelfart / DK | [1982/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lauridsen, Ivan Rechnagel Poppelvej 30 DK-5492 Vissenbjerg / DK | [1982/37] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/37] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82101381.0 | 24.02.1982 | [1982/37] | Priority number, date | DK19810000914 | 27.02.1981 Original published format: DK 91481 | [1982/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059881 | Date: | 15.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A47G9/02 | [1982/37] | CPC: |
A47G9/0207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/37] | Title | German: | Steppdecke und Bettbezug mit einer solchen Steppdecke und wenigstens zwei isolierenden Füllmaterialien | [1982/37] | English: | Ribbed tick and bedding article comprising such ribbed tick and at least two insulating fillers | [1982/37] | French: | Enveloppe piquée et article de literie comportant une telle enveloppe piquée et au moins deux matériaux de rembourrage isolants | [1982/37] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 10.06.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/47] | 21.08.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB420722 (ALBERT WILLIAM SINCLAIR); | [X]US3787906 (HUNT H) |