Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] |
18.04.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.06.1986 [1986/23] |
09.12.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.02.1984 [1984/06] |
09.07.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.09.1983 [1983/36] |