EP0087484 - Method of detecting foreign matters mixed in a liquid contained in transparent receptacles and apparatus relevant thereto [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Toshio No. 2677-2, Honjo-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Liebau, Gerhard Patentanwaltsbüro Liebau & Liebau Postfach 22 02 29 D-86182 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Liebau, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Liebau & Liebau Postfach 22 02 29 D-86182 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 82101518.7 | 27.02.1982 | [1983/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0087484 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087484 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/90 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
G01N21/9027 (EP);
G01N33/0081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Detektion von Fremdkörpern in einer in einem durchsichtigen Gefäss enthaltenen Flüssigkeit und dazugehörende Einrichtung | [1983/36] | English: | Method of detecting foreign matters mixed in a liquid contained in transparent receptacles and apparatus relevant thereto | [1983/36] | French: | Procédé pour détecter des corps étrangers dans un liquide contenu dans un récipient transparent et appareil pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1983/36] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/06] | 21.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4058737 (TAKAHASHI TOSHIO, et al); | [A]US4087184 (KNAPP JULIUS Z, et al); | [A]US4274745 (TAKAHASHI TOSHIO, et al) | [A] - L'ONDE ELECTRIQUE, vol. 59, no. 2, February 1979, pages 26-27, Paris (FR); | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 19, no. 7, April 1980, pages 1105-1112, New York (USA); |