blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0061023

EP0061023 - Process for the enzymatic preparation of esters and lactones [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.12.1984
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.1984No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.02.1985 [1985/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH
Postfach 12 53
37601 Holzminden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/39]For all designated states
HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH
Postfach 12 53
D-37601 Holzminden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gatfield, Ian, Dr.
Ulmenweg 23
D-3470 Höxter / DE
02 / Sand, Theodor, Dr.
Vogelsang 3
D-3450 Holzminden / DE
[1982/39]
Representative(s)Dill, Erwin, et al
c/o BAYER AG Zentralbereich Patente Marken und Lizenzen Bayerwerk
D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/39]Dill, Erwin, Dr., et al
c/o BAYER AG Zentralbereich Patente Marken und Lizenzen Bayerwerk
D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE
Application number, filing date82101560.901.03.1982
[1982/39]
Priority number, dateDE1981310892710.03.1981         Original published format: DE 3108927
[1982/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0061023
Date:29.09.1982
Language:DE
[1982/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0061023
Date:08.02.1984
Language:DE
[1984/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.1982
ClassificationIPC:C12P7/62
[1982/39]
CPC:
C12P17/04 (EP,US); C12P7/62 (EP,US); Y10S435/931 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1982/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur enzymatischen Herstellung von Estern und Laktonen[1982/39]
English:Process for the enzymatic preparation of esters and lactones[1982/39]
French:Procédé de préparation enzymatique d'esters et de lactones[1982/39]
Examination procedure01.03.1982Examination requested  [1982/39]
18.04.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
14.07.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.1983Fee for grant paid
23.07.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.11.1984No opposition filed within time limit [1985/07]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP54041385  ;
 [AP]JP56032994  ;
 [A]FR1406122  (PFIZER & CO C)
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 91, Nr. 11, 10. September 1979, Seite 609, Nr. 89538f, Columbus, Ohio, (USA) & JP-A-54 041 385 (TSUJISAKA, YOSHIO et al.) (02-04-1979), & JP54041385 A 00000000
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 87, Nr. 19, 7. November 1977, Seite 440, Nr. 150318v, Columbus, Ohio, (USA)
 [AP]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 5, Nr. 89 (C-58)(761), 10. Juni 1981; & JP-A-56 032 994 (NIPPON TERUPEN KAGAKU K.K.) (02-04-1981), & JP56032994 A 00000000
Examination   - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS; Band 91, Nr. 11, 10. September 1979, Seite 609, Nr. 89538f, Columbus, Ohio, USA
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.