EP0086862 - Stomach-volume reduction apparatus with intragastric positionable cushion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.08.1987 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sir Huckleberry Assurance Services Limited 23 Great Castle Street London WIN 8 NQ / GB | [1983/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frimberger, Ferdinand, Dr. Josef-Kösel-Weg 10 D-8960 Kempten/Allgäu / DE | 02 /
Frimberger, Eckart, Dr. Tristanstrasse 12 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1983/35] | Representative(s) | Charrier, Rolf, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Charrier, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1984/20] | Charrier, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Charrier, Dr. Rapp, Dr. Waibel, Dr. Bauer Rehlingenstrasse 8 D-86153 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 82101703.5 | 04.03.1982 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | DE19823206118 | 19.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3206118 | [1983/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0086862 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0086862 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00, A61M29/02 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
A61F5/003 (EP);
A61F5/0036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verkleinerung des Magenreservoirs mit einem intragastral applizierbaren Kissen | [1983/35] | English: | Stomach-volume reduction apparatus with intragastric positionable cushion | [1983/35] | French: | Appareil pour la réduction du volume de l'estomac avec un coussin intragastral | [1983/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/18] | 14.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.06.1988
22.01.1989
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED I.T.M. Holding N.V. Banco di Caribe Building 205 D Schottegatweg Curaçao / AN Opponent's representative Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2015/17] |
Former [2008/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.06.1988
22.01.1989
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED I.T.M. Holding N.V. Banco di Caribe Building 205 D Schottegatweg Curaçao / AN Opponent's representative Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.06.1988
22.01.1989
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED I.T.M. Holding N.V. Banco di Caribe Building 205 D Schottegatweg Curaçao / AN Opponent's representative Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.06.1988
I.T.M. Holding N.V. Banco di Caribe Building 205 D Schottegatweg Curaçao / AN Opponent's representative Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | 26.09.1988 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.09.1987 | LU | 31.03.1988 | AT | 04.03.1992 | GB | 04.03.1992 | SE | 05.03.1992 | BE | 31.03.1992 | CH | 31.03.1992 | LI | 31.03.1992 | NL | 01.10.1992 | FR | 31.03.1998 | DE | 01.12.1998 | [2002/30] |
Former [1999/52] | IT | 16.09.1987 | |
LU | 31.03.1988 | ||
AT | 04.03.1992 | ||
GB | 04.03.1992 | ||
SE | 05.03.1992 | ||
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
NL | 01.10.1992 | ||
DE | 01.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 16.09.1987 | |
AT | 04.03.1992 | ||
GB | 04.03.1992 | ||
SE | 05.03.1992 | ||
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
NL | 01.10.1992 | ||
DE | 01.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/30] | AT | 04.03.1992 | |
GB | 04.03.1992 | ||
SE | 05.03.1992 | ||
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
NL | 01.10.1992 | ||
DE | 01.12.1998 | ||
Former [1993/46] | AT | 04.03.1992 | |
GB | 04.03.1992 | ||
SE | 05.03.1992 | ||
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
NL | 01.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 04.03.1992 | |
SE | 05.03.1992 | ||
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
NL | 01.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/14] | SE | 05.03.1992 | |
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
NL | 01.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | SE | 05.03.1992 | |
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | SE | 05.03.1992 | |
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/52] | SE | 05.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3834394 (HUNTER J, et al); | [A]US4133315 (BERMAN EDWARD J, et al) | Examination | DE2822925 |