EP0062762 - Chemo-electromagnetic generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1986 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1986 [1986/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gambino, Richard Joseph 2433 Hunter Brook Road Yorktown Heights New York 10598 / US | 02 /
Ruf, Ralph Richard 195 Long Clove Road New City New York 10596 / US | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | Blakemore, Frederick Norman, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | Blakemore, Frederick Norman, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1982/42] | Lancaster, James Donald IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester, Hants, S021 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 82101852.0 | 09.03.1982 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | US19810252655 | 09.04.1981 Original published format: US 252655 | [1982/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0062762 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0062762 | Date: | 24.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0062762 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02N11/00, H02K57/00 | [1982/42] | CPC: |
H10N15/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/42] | Title | German: | Chemisch-elektromagnetischer Generator | [1982/42] | English: | Chemo-electromagnetic generator | [1982/42] | French: | Générateur électromagnéto-chimique | [1982/42] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/17] | 02.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR642771 ; | [AD]US2510801 (CONSTANTIN CHILOWSKY); | [A]FR1104774 ; | [AD]US3477878 (HUGHES WILLIAM LEWIS, et al) |