EP0065628 - Method and apparatus for compensating defectuous signals reproduced from a magnetic medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.1986 [1986/07] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | For:FR
GB
International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaller, Karl Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Eifelstrasse 6 D-7033 Herrenberg 1 / DE | 02 /
Zimmermann, Volker, Dr.-Ing. Banater Strasse 51 D-7032 Sindelfingen / DE | [1982/48] | Representative(s) | Gaugel, Heinz, et al Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/15] | Gaugel, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [1982/48] | Herzog, Friedrich Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Birkenstrasse 77 D-71155 Altdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 82101860.3 | 09.03.1982 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | DE19813120327 | 22.05.1981 Original published format: DE 3120327 | [1982/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065628 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065628 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/58, G11B5/02, G11B21/10 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
G11B5/02 (EP,US);
G11B5/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Kompensieren von Signaleinbrüchen in von magnetischen Aufzeichnungsträgern gelesenen Signalen | [1982/48] | English: | Method and apparatus for compensating defectuous signals reproduced from a magnetic medium | [1982/48] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de compensation de signaux défectueux, reproduits d'un support magnétique | [1982/48] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/22] | 03.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1147261 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2460083 (IBM DEUTSCHLAND); | [A]US3305731 (FRAZER WELSH HERBERT) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 21, Nr. 3, August 1978, Seiten 932-933, New York (USA); | [AD] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 22, Nr. 8A, Januar 1980, Seiten 3127-3130, New York (USA); |