blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0063234

EP0063234 - Extruded hollow plastics profile member for window frames, window frame composed of such profile members and manufacturing method of such a window frame [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.1986
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB
published on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schock & Co. GmbH
Gmünder Strasse 65
73614 Schorndorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/43]For all designated states
Schock & Co. GmbH
Gmünder Strasse 65
D-73614 Schorndorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schock, Karl
Aichenbachstrasse 136
D-7060 Schorndorf / DE
02 / Frank, Lothar
Schneeberg 51
D-7067 Plüderhausen / DE
[1982/43]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/43]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
D-70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date82101931.211.03.1982
[1982/43]
Priority number, dateDE1981311525415.04.1981         Original published format: DE 3115254
DE1981313686317.09.1981         Original published format: DE 3136863
[1982/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0063234
Date:27.10.1982
Language:DE
[1982/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0063234
Date:21.08.1985
Language:DE
[1985/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.1982
ClassificationIPC:E06B3/22, B29C65/00
[1985/34]
CPC:
E06B3/9608 (EP,US); B29C37/04 (EP,US); B29C65/20 (EP,US);
B29C66/1142 (EP,US); B29C66/14 (EP,US); B29C66/43 (EP,US);
B29C66/5241 (EP,US); B29C66/5243 (EP,US); B29C66/721 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US); B29C66/72141 (EP,US); B29C66/723 (EP,US);
B29C66/725 (EP,US); B29C66/72523 (EP,US); B29C66/7392 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US); E06B3/221 (EP,US); B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US); B29K2027/06 (EP,US); B29K2033/04 (EP,US);
B29K2055/02 (EP,US); B29K2063/00 (EP,US); B29K2067/06 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (EP,US); B29K2101/12 (EP,US); B29K2105/06 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0809 (EP,US); B29K2105/101 (EP,US); B29K2105/206 (EP,US);
B29K2309/08 (EP,US); B29L2009/00 (EP,US); B29L2031/005 (EP,US);
E06B2003/228 (EP,US); Y10S49/02 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/723, B29C65/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/04 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2055/02 (US,EP)
(-)
Former IPC [1982/43]E06B3/22, B29C27/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1982/43]
TitleGerman:Extrudierte Kunststoff-Hohlprofilleiste für Fensterrahmen, aus derartigen Profilleisten hergestellter Fensterrahmen und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Fensterrahmens[1982/43]
English:Extruded hollow plastics profile member for window frames, window frame composed of such profile members and manufacturing method of such a window frame[1982/43]
French:Profilé creux extrudé en matière plastique pour châssis de fenêtre, châssis de fenêtre constitué par de tels profilés et procédé de fabrication d'un tel châssis[1982/43]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure21.04.1983Examination requested  [1983/27]
17.01.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.05.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
11.01.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.1985Fee for grant paid
09.03.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.05.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE21.08.1985
FR21.08.1985
IT21.08.1985
NL21.08.1985
SE30.08.1985
AT11.03.1986
CH31.03.1986
LI31.03.1986
LU31.03.1986
[2002/24]
Former [1999/52]BE21.08.1985
IT21.08.1985
NL21.08.1985
SE30.08.1985
AT11.03.1986
GB11.03.1986
CH31.03.1986
LI31.03.1986
LU31.03.1986
Former [1999/42]BE21.08.1985
IT21.08.1985
NL21.08.1985
SE30.08.1985
AT11.03.1986
GB11.03.1986
CH31.03.1986
LI31.03.1986
Former [1989/27]BE21.08.1985
NL21.08.1985
SE30.08.1985
AT11.03.1986
GB11.03.1986
CH31.03.1986
LI31.03.1986
Former [1989/22]BE21.08.1985
NL21.08.1985
SE30.08.1985
AT11.03.1986
CH31.03.1986
LI31.03.1986
Former [1989/08]BE21.08.1985
NL21.08.1985
SE30.08.1985
AT11.03.1986
Former [1988/13]BE21.08.1985
NL21.08.1985
SE30.08.1985
Former [1988/04]BE21.08.1985
NL21.08.1985
Former [1986/32]NL21.08.1985
Documents cited:Search[A]US3919034  (CARINI PIERTOMMASO);
 [A]FR1256716  (FROMM G M B H A);
 [A]US3866373  (HUDOCK JOHN S);
 [A]EP0010593  (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]);
 [A]BE644596  ;
 [A]DE1784380  (ELSNER LOTHAR);
 [A]DE2638202  (URBAN GMBH & CO ELEKTROTECHNIK)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.