Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
06.06.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.1984 [1984/32] |
01.09.1982 | Change - representative | published on 03.11.1982 [1982/44] |
27.08.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.10.1982 [1982/43] |
27.08.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.10.1982 [1982/43] |