Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1185596 | 16.04.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3113760 | 04.04.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3113760 | 28.10.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3113760 | 04.04.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE8110077U | 24.09.1981 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE8110077 | 03.04.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0063241 | Global Dossier | 27.10.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3113760 | 04.04.1981 | DE8110077 | 03.04.1981 |