EP0063241 - Electrically powered driving device for food processors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | [1982/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falkenbach, Günther Leiershohl-Strasse 18 a D-6236 Eschborn I / DE | 02 /
Seuwen, Dieter Am Steinberg 23 D-6000 Frankfurt 56 / DE | 03 /
Schneider, Jürgen Oberurseler Strasse 59 a D-6242 Kronberg 2 / DE | 04 /
Kahlcke, Hartwig Parkstrasse 9 D-6232 Bad Soden / DE | [1982/43] | Representative(s) | Einsele, Rolf Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1120 61466 Kronberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | Einsele, Rolf Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | ||
Former [1982/43] | Einsele, Rolf Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1120 Frankfurter Strasse 145 D-6242 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102209.2 | 18.03.1982 | [1982/43] | Priority number, date | DE19813113760 | 04.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3113760 | DE19810010077U | 03.04.1981 Original published format: DE 8110077 U | [1982/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063241 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/08, A47J43/044 | [1982/43] | CPC: |
A47J43/0766 (EP);
A47J43/044 (EP);
A47J43/046 (EP);
A47J43/0755 (EP);
A47J43/0777 (EP);
A47J43/082 (EP);
A47J2043/04481 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/43] | Title | German: | Elektromotorisch betriebenes Antriebsaggregat, insbesondere für Mehrzweck-Küchenmaschinen | [1982/43] | English: | Electrically powered driving device for food processors | [1982/43] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement à moteur électrique pour robots de cuisine | [1982/43] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 19.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/43] | 13.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/32] | 27.02.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1181870 ; | [A]GB873685 ; | [A]GB953697 ; | [A]US4026532 ; | [A]DE1125601 ; | [A]DE2301577 ; | [A]NL110380C ; | [A]US2771280 ; | [A]DE1429819 ; | [A]US2372862 ; | [A]EP0004987 ; | [AD]DE1132689 ; | [AD]DE1083993 ; | [AD]DE2551842 |