EP0061181 - Guest-host type liquid crystal composition and liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1985 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/39] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imazeki, Shuji 20-3, Ayukawacho-6-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 02 /
Mukoh, Akio 498-21, Kasaharacho Mito-shi / JP | 03 /
Sato, Mikio 967, Ishinazakacho Hitachi-shi / JP | 04 /
Imahori, Seiichi 11-14, Chiyogaoka-7-chome Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | 05 /
Kaneko, Masaharu 3684-24, Shimotsuruma Yamato-shi / JP | 06 /
Ozawa, Tetsuo 18-24, Soshigaya-4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1982/39] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Postfach 95 01 60 81517 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Postfach 95 01 60 D-81517 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/39] | Von Füner, Alexander, Dr. K.L. Schiff Dr. A. von Funer Dipl.-Ing. P. Strehl Dr. U. Schübel-Hopf Dipl.-Ing. D. Ebbinghaus Dr.-Ing. D. Finck Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-8000 München 90 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102298.5 | 19.03.1982 | [1982/39] | Priority number, date | JP19810039336 | 20.03.1981 Original published format: JP 3933681 | [1982/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0061181 | Date: | 29.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0061181 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/34, G02F1/133, C09B1/22 | [1982/39] | CPC: |
C09B1/22 (EP,US);
C09B31/043 (EP,US);
C09B31/062 (EP,US);
C09K19/603 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1982/39] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristall-Zusammensetzung vom Typ "Gast-Wirt" und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung | [1982/39] | English: | Guest-host type liquid crystal composition and liquid crystal display device | [1982/39] | French: | Composition à base de cristal liquide du type "invité-hôte" et dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide | [1982/39] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 29.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/06] | 08.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2010306 (BASF AG) |