EP0062227 - Artificial control and reference serum, method of making the same and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.1984 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 35001 Marburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/41] | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 D-35001 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Wolfgang, Dr. Quotshäuserweg 20 D-3564 Steffenberg / DE | 02 /
Oeding, Volker, Dr. Zur Klause 7 D-3550 Marburg/Lahn / DE | 03 /
Pauly, Hans Erwin, Dr. Finkenstrasse 1 D-3563 Dautphetal / DE | [1982/41] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP Franklinstrasse 61-63 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/41] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr., et al Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102389.2 | 23.03.1982 | [1982/41] | Priority number, date | DE19813112334 | 28.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3112334 | [1982/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0062227 | Date: | 13.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/96 | [1982/41] | CPC: |
G01N33/96 (EP);
G01N2496/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/41] | Title | German: | Künstliche Kontroll- und Standardseren, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1982/41] | English: | Artificial control and reference serum, method of making the same and its use | [1982/41] | French: | Sérum artificiel de contrôle et de référence, son procédé de préparation et son application | [1982/41] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 23.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/22] | 27.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3980764 ; | [A]DE2902677 |