EP0062798 - Improvement in electrostatic copying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Higashi-ku Osaka 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Higashi-ku Osaka 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kajita, Hiroshi 5-19 Tomogaoka 5-chome Suma-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Iseki, Masahide 24-33 Ikeda Asahi-machi Neyagawa-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Nakajima, Tadanobu 218-2 Oaza Miwa Sakurai-shi Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Kawamori, Yoshizo 2-14-34 Kitaoka Fujiidera-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/42] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102455.1 | 24.03.1982 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | JP19810047874 | 31.03.1981 Original published format: JP 4787481 | JP19810047875 | 31.03.1981 Original published format: JP 4787581 | [1982/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0062798 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0062798 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/62 | [1982/42] | CPC: |
G03G15/605 (EP,US);
G03B27/6257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/42] | Title | German: | Elektrostatisches Kopiergerät | [1982/42] | English: | Improvement in electrostatic copying apparatus | [1982/42] | French: | Machine à copier électrostatique | [1982/42] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 20.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP84100550.7 / EP0120201 | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2033842 (CANON KK); | [Y]US4214832 (ARIYAMA KENZO [JP], et al); | [A]US4143960 (TRACY MICHAEL J); | [A]US3685905 (MARSHALL GEORGE E, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 19, no. 5, October 1076, pages 1589-1591, New York (USA); | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 1, June 1980, pages 69-70, New York (USA); | [A] - XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, vol. 5, no. 3, May/June 1980, page 257; | Examination | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 19, no. 5, October 1976, pages 1589-1591, New York (USA); J.H.HUBBARD et al.: "Copier controls" |