EP0061750 - Projection unit including glass reflector with insulative cap member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GTE Products Corporation 100 West 10th Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [1982/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blaisdell, Ronald G. 15 Dustin Street Saugus, Ma. 01906 / US | 02 /
Hough, Harold L. 51 Brimball Avenue Beverley, Ma. 01915 / US | 03 /
Martenson, Richard B. 22 Grey Lane Lynnfield, Ma 10940 / US | [1982/40] | Representative(s) | Lemke, Jörg-Michael Jung HML Patentanwälte Hofmarkstrasse 10 - Arnhofen 86447 Aindling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Lemke, Jörg-Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Schmiedstrasse 1, Hausen D-86447 Aindling / DE | ||
Former [1984/39] | Lemke, Jörg-Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Schmiedstrasse 1, Hausen D-86447 Aindling / DE | ||
Former [1984/36] | Lemke, Jörg-Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Schmiedstrasse 1, Hausen D-86447 Aindling / DE | ||
Former [1982/40] | Reinländer & Bernhardt Patentanwälte Orthstrasse 12 D-8000 München 60 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102582.2 | 26.03.1982 | [1982/40] | Priority number, date | US19810248168 | 30.03.1981 Original published format: US 248168 | [1982/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0061750 | Date: | 06.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0061750 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0061750 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/20, G02B27/18 | [1982/40] | CPC: |
G03B21/202 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1982/40] | Title | German: | Projektionseinrichtung mit Glasreflektor und Isolierkappe | [1982/40] | English: | Projection unit including glass reflector with insulative cap member | [1982/40] | French: | Dispositif de projection incluant un réflecteur de verre et une coiffe isolante | [1986/08] |
Former [1982/40] | Arrangement de projection y compris un réflecteur de verre et une coiffe isolante | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 26.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/40] | 03.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 12.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2046893 ; | [Y]US4148569 ; | [Y]US3761170 ; | [AD]US3789212 |