Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0061750
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.12.1986 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] |
03.01.1986 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.02.1986 [1986/08] |
17.12.1985 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.02.1986 [1986/08] |
24.07.1984 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.09.1984 [1984/39] |
05.07.1984 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.09.1984 [1984/36] |
11.01.1983 |
Publication of search report |
published on 16.03.1983 [1983/11] |
09.08.1982 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.1982 [1982/40] |
09.08.1982 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.10.1982 [1982/40] |