EP0062860 - High temperature insulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.1984 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAUDER ENERGY SYSTEMS, INC. 220 Weaver Street Emporia Kansas 66801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | For all designated states SAUDER ENERGY SYSTEMS, INC. 220 Weaver Street Emporia Kansas 66801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauder, Robert A. 2000 Morningside Drive Emporia Kansas 66801 / US | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102833.9 | 02.04.1982 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | US19810254116 | 14.04.1981 Original published format: US 254116 | [1982/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0062860 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/00, F27D1/14 | [1982/42] | CPC: |
F27D1/002 (EP);
C04B35/00 (KR);
F27D1/144 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/42] | Title | German: | Hitzebeständige Isolierung | [1982/42] | English: | High temperature insulation | [1982/42] | French: | Revêtement à haute résistance thermique | [1982/42] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 09.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/21] | 29.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/08] | 04.09.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1506931 (HICKS WILLIAM D); | [A]US1579546 (KARL LEHPAMER); | [Y]US3089284 (PEARCE HEUER RUSSELL); | [A]US3275073 (MEYER PINCUS); | [X]US3591152 (MILLS BONNIE E JR); | [Y]US3990203 (GREAVES JAMES R); | [A]FR2406779 (MCKECHNIE REFRACTORY FIBRES [GB]) |