EP0062893 - Process for producing plant extracts with sensory properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.10.1988 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. Route no. 222 Trexlertown Pennsylvania 18087 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. Route no. 222 Trexlertown Pennsylvania 18087 / US | ||
Former [1982/42] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wüst, Reinhold Jahnstrasse 23 D-4044 Kaarst / DE | 02 /
Pfeiffer, Hans, Dr. Röntgenstrasse 32 D-5657 Haan / DE | 03 /
Van der Mei, Henk Am Hisskamp 4 D-3260 Rinteln 3 / DE | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/20] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102968.3 | 07.04.1982 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | DE19813115157 | 15.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3115157 | [1982/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0062893 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0062893 | Date: | 20.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/221, A23F3/42, B01D11/02 | [1982/42] | CPC: |
B01D11/0203 (EP);
A23F3/34 (EP);
A23F3/423 (EP);
A23L27/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Pflanzenextrakten mit verbesserten sensorischen Eigenschaften | [1982/42] | English: | Process for producing plant extracts with sensory properties | [1982/42] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'extraits végétaux avec de propriétes sensorielles | [1982/42] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/24] | 14.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.1985
09.12.1985
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.1985
09.12.1985
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 08.01.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.07.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.08.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 05.08.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.07.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/47] | Appeal following opposition | 05.10.1987 | Appeal received No. T0336/87 | 27.07.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.04.1985 | SE | 08.04.1988 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | CH | 20.02.1985 | |
LI | 20.02.1985 | ||
LU | 30.04.1985 | ||
SE | 08.04.1988 | ||
Former [1989/27] | CH | 20.02.1985 | |
LI | 20.02.1985 | ||
SE | 08.04.1988 | ||
Former [1989/23] | SE | 08.04.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2436130 [ ]; | DE2709033 [ ] (DEGUSSA); | FR2382199 [ ] (DEGUSSA [DE]); | US4167589 [ ] (VITZTHUM OTTO, et al); | EP0010665 [ ] (HAG AG [DE]) | Examination | DE2931395 |